No. 18-272
Title:Jim Yovino, Fresno County Superintendent of Schools, Petitioner
v.
Aileen Rizo
Docketed:September 4, 2018
Linked with 17A1404
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15372)
   Decision Date:April 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 22 2018Application (17A1404) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 8, 2018 to August 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 26 2018Application (17A1404) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 23, 2018.
Aug 13 2018Application (17A1404) to extend further the time from August 23, 2018 to September 4, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Aug 15 2018Application (17A1404) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 4, 2018.
Aug 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2018 to November 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 5, 2018.
Oct 04 2018Brief amici curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2018Brief of respondent Aileen Rizo in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Reply of petitioner Fresno County Superintendent of Schools filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Fresno County Superintendent of Schools
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel Mark Siegel
    Counsel of Record
Siegel, Yee & Brunner
475 14th Street
Suite 500
Oakland, CA 94612

DanMSiegel@gmail.com
(510) 839-1200
Party name: Aileen Rizo
Other
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Society for Human Resource Management
Rae Thiesfield Vann
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rvann@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance and NFIB Small Business Legal Center