No. 18-266
Title:The Dutra Group, Petitioner
v.
Christopher Batterton
Docketed:August 31, 2018
Linked with 17A1354
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-56775)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2018Application (17A1354) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 31, 2018 to August 30, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main Document
Jun 07 2018Application (17A1354) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 30, 2018.
Aug 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Dutra Group.
Blanket Consent
Sep 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 25 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Christopher Batterton.
Blanket Consent
Sep 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 31, 2018.
Oct 01 2018Brief amici curiae of At-Sea Processors Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Maritime Law Association of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2018Brief of respondent Christopher Batterton in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 13 2018Reply of petitioner The Dutra Group filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 07 2018Petition GRANTED.
Dec 21 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Dutra Group.
Blanket Consent
Dec 28 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner The Dutra Group.
Main Document
Jan 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Christopher Batterton.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 14 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Brief of petitioner The Dutra Group filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Amicus brief of Dredging Contractors of America and Council for Dredging & Marine Construction Safety not accepted for filing. (Partial submission.)
Jan 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Dredging Contractors of America and Council for Dredging & Marine Construction Safety filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 25, 2019
Jan 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Inland River Harbor and Fleeting Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Brief amici curiae of At-Sea Processors Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and International Group of P&I Clubs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Brief amici curiae of Fishing Vessels' Reserve, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Maritime Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Drilling Contractors (IADC) filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2019Brief amici curiae of The Greater New Orleans Barge Fleeting Association, Inc. and Offshore Marine Service Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of Waterways Council, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of The American Waterways Operators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2019Amicus brief of Injured Crewmembers Tevrin Narcisse and James Stelpstra submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: The Dutra Group
Attorneys for Respondent
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Christopher Batterton
Preston EasleyLaw Offices of Preston Easley APC
2500 Via Cabrillo Marina
Suite 106
San Pedro, CA 90731

maritime@earthlink.net
310-832-5315
Party name: Christopher Batterton
Other
Michael A. Barcott
    Counsel of Record
Holmes Weddle & Barcott
999 Third Avenue
Suite 2600
Seattle, WA 98104

mbarcott@hwb-law.com
206-292-8008
Party name: Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Coastal Marine Fund, Fishermen's Finest, Inc., Global Seas LLC, Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC, North Star Fishing Company LLC, North Star Insurance Services, LLC, Ocean Peace, Inc. O'Hara Corporation, Trident Seafoods Corporation, United Catcher Boats Association, and United States Seafoods, LLC
William Paul Doyle Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Dredging Contractors of America
503 D Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

wdoyle@dredgingcontractors.org
12025384948
Party name: Dredging Contractors of America and Council for Dredging & Marine Construction Safety
Kenneth G. Engerrand
    Counsel of Record
Brown Sims, P.C.
1177 West Loop South, Tenth Floor
Houston, TX 77027

kengerrand@brownsims.com
713-629-1580
Party name: Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc.
Molly Joan Henry
    Counsel of Record
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt
1420 Fifth Avenue
Suite 3400
Seattle, WA 98101

mhenry@schwabe.com
206-622-1711
Party name: Maritime Law Association of the United States
Neal Wayne Settergren
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Price, L.C.
One Memorial Drive, Suite 1000
Saint Louis, MO 63102

neal@gp-law.com
(314) 516-1711
Party name: The Inland River Harbor and Fleeting Coalition
Michael F. Sturley
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705-0000

msturley@law.utexas.edu
5122321350
Party name: Injured Crewmembers Tevrin Narcisse and James Stelpstra
Evan Mark Tager
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

etager@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: At-Sea Processors Association, Pacific Seafood Processors Association, Groundfish Forum, National Fisheries Institute, Freezer Longline Coalition, and Alaska Bering Sea Crabbers
James T. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Holman Fenwick Willan LLP
5151 SAN FELIPE
SUITE 400
HOUSTON, TX 77056

jim.brown@hfw.com
713-917-0888
Party name: International Association of Drilling Contractors (IADC)
Michael Joseph Cummins
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Robb & Lindh LLP
201 Mission Street, Ste. 2700
San Francisco, CA 94105

mcummins@gibsonrobb.com
(415) 348-6000
Party name: FISHING VESSELS’ RESERVE, UNITED MARINE FUND, UNITED RESERVE FUND, WEST COAST MARINE FUND, PACIFIC MARINE FUND, AND AMERICAN MARINE FUND
George J. Fowler III
    Counsel of Record
Jones Walker
201 St. Charles Avenue
Suite 5100
New Orleans, LA 70170

gfowler@joneswalker.com
504-582-8752
Party name: The Greater New Orleans Barge Fleeting Association, Inc. and Offshore Marine Service Association
Don K. Haycraft
    Counsel of Record
Liskow & Lewis
One Shell Square, Suite 5000
701 Poydras Street
New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

dkhaycraft@liskow.com
504-556-4128
Party name: Waterways Council, Inc.
Barbara L. Holland
    Counsel of Record
Garvey, Schubert & Barer
1191 Second Avenue, 18th Floor
Seattle, WA 98101-2939

bholland@gsblaw.com
206-816-1307
Party name: The American Waterways Operators
Jane Blair Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
Klein Zelman Briton et al.
485 Madison Avenue, 15th Floor
New York, NY 10022

jbjacobs@kleinzelman.com
2129356020
Party name: American Maritime Association, Inc.
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and International Group of P&I Clubs