No. 18-260
Title:County of Maui, Hawaii, Petitioner
v.
Hawaii Wildlife Fund, et al.
Docketed:August 30, 2018
Linked with 17A1343
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-17447)
   Decision Date:March 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 31 2018Application (17A1343) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 28, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Application (17A1343) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 27, 2018.
Aug 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 31, 2018.
Oct 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Association of California Water Agencies, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2018Brief of respondents Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Reply of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 20 2018Supplemental brief of respondents Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States on or before 4 p.m., Friday, January 4, 2019.
Jan 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 07 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2019Second supplemental brief of respondents Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 30 2019Letter of January 28, 2019, from counsel for petitioner received.
Main Document
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Mar 05 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 9, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 12, 2019.
Apr 04 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 09 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost received)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 09 2019Brief of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Agricultural Business Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Clean Water Agencies, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of United States Senators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Wychmere Shores Condominium Trust, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Edison Electric Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. and Plantation Pipe Line Company, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Federal Water Quality Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, 19 other States, and the Governors of Kentucky and Mississippi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Water Systems Council and The National Groundwater Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Florida Water Environmental Association- Utility Council; Florida Rural Water Association; Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group- Environmental Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 25 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 26 2019Letter to the Court of Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. not accepted for filing. (July 12, 2019 - Not the type of letter to be submitted through the electronic filing system)
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 6, 2019.
Jul 12 2019Brief of respondents Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Upstate Forever and Savannah Riverkeeper filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Former EPA Administrators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Trout Unlimited filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Former EPA Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Craft Brewers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Maryland, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Anderson County, South Carolina and Decatur County, Tennessee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Aquatic Scientists and Scientific Societies filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Reply of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 17 2019Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Sep 17 2019Record received from the U.S.D.C. of Hawaii is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of electronically filed Sealed documents.
Oct 03 2019Letter of respondents Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al. filed.
Main Document
Oct 04 2019Letter of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2019Letter of petitioner County of Maui, Hawaii filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: County of Maui, Hawaii
Michael R. ShebelskieHunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219

mshebelskie@huntonak.com
804-788-8200
Party name: County of Maui, Hawaii
Attorneys for Respondents
David Lane Henkin
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
850 Richards Street, Suite 400
Honolulu, HI 96813

dhenkin@earthjustice.org
8085992436
Party name: Hawai'i Wildlife Fund, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
304-558-2021
Party name: State of West Virginia, 19 other States, and the Governors of Kentucky and Mississippi
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: Agricultural Business Organizations
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. and Plantation Pipe Line Company, Inc.
Richard Scott Davis
    Counsel of Record
Beveridge & Diamond, P.C.
1350 I Street, N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005

rdavis@bdlaw.com
202-789-6025
Party name: National Association of Clean Water Agencies
Kristen Candice DiotHopping Green & Sams, P.A.
119 South Monroe Street, Suite 300
Tallahassee, FL 32301

kristend@hgslaw.com
850-222-7500
Party name: Florida Water Environmental Association- Utility Council; Florida Rural Water Association; Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group- Environmental Committee
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, et al.
2000 K Street, N.W
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@robbinsrussell.com
2027754503
Party name: Trout Unlimited
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Energy Transfer Partners, L.P.
Royal C. Gardner
    Counsel of Record
Stetson Univ. College of Law
1401 61st Street South
St. Petersburg, FL 33707

gardner@law.stetson.edu
727-562-7864
Party name: Aquatic Scientists and Scientific Societies
Shaun Alaric Goho
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Environmental Law & Policy Clinic
6 Everett St., Suite 5116
Cambridge, MA 02138

sgoho@law.harvard.edu
617-496-2058
Party name: Former EPA Officials
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
    Counsel of Record
Texas Public Policy Foundation
901 Congress Avenue
Austin, TX 78701

tha@texaspolicy.com
512-472-2700
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Former EPA Administrators
Caleb Adam Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Environmental and Regulatory Law Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

cjaffe@law.virginia.edu
4349244776
Party name: Anderson County, South Carolina and Decatur County, Tennessee
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7902
Party name: Upstate Forever and Savannah Riverkeeper
Richard B. Kendall
    Counsel of Record
Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP
10100 Santa Monica Blvd.
Suite 1725
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rkendall@kbkfirm.com
3105562700
Party name: Craft Brewers
Elise Laine Larson
    Counsel of Record
Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy
1919 University Avenue West, Suite 515
Saint Paul, MN 55104

elarson@mncenter.org
651-287-4880
Party name: Fond du Lac Band of Lake Superior Chippewa
Thomas Allen Lorenzen
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

tlorenzen@crowell.com
202-624-2500
Party name: Edison Electric Institute, et al.
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: United States Senators
Kevin Michael McGinty
    Counsel of Record
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

KMcGinty@mintz.com
617-542-6000
Party name: Wychmere Shores Condominium Trust and Longwood Venues & Destinations, Inc.
Jonathan Gerard Andre Monette
    Counsel of Record
Best Best & Krieger, LP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W., Suite 5300
Washington, DC 20006

andre.monette@bbklaw.com
(202) 785-0600
Party name: National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.
Gary Vergil Perko
    Counsel of Record
Hopping Green & Sams, P.A.
P.O. Box 6526
Tallahassee, FL 32314

garyp@hgslaw.com
8502227500
Party name: Florida Water Environmental Association- Utility Council; Florida Rural Water Association; Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group- Environmental Committee
Jesse James Richardson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jesse J. Richardson, Jr.
969 Vandalia Road
Morgantown, WV 26501

jessehokie@gmail.com
15403277508
Party name: National Groundwater Association and Water Systems Council
Stephen E. Roady
    Counsel of Record
Duke University School of Law
210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27708

steve.roady@duke.edu
919 613 7061
Party name: Law Professors
Glenn Evans Roper
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
1745 Shea Center Drive, Suite 400
Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

GERoper@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Damien Michael SchiffPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Joshua Morris Segal
    Counsel of Record
Maryland Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

jsegal@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6446
Party name: State of Maryland et al.
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
713-229-1234
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Thomas Jon Ward
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

tward@nahb.org
202 266-8230
Party name: National Association of Home Builders of the United States
Alan Bruce White
    Counsel of Record
Barnes & Thornburg LLLLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 4400
Chicago, IL 60606

bwhite@btlaw.com
312-357-1313
Party name: Federal Water Quality Coalition