No. 18-238
Title:South Carolina, Petitioner
v.
Lamont Antonio Samuel
Docketed:August 23, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of South Carolina
   Case Numbers:(27768)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 25, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 24, 2018
Oct 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 23, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Edgar Salter III
    Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
P.O.Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211

esalter@scag.gov
803-734-6305
Party name: State of South Carolina
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel Roy Ortiz
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dortiz@law.virginia.edu
4349243127
Party name: Lamont Samuel