No. 18-234
Title:Guadalupe Chaidez Campos, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 22, 2018
Linked with 18A55
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-51476)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2018Application (18A55) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 23, 2018 to August 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 16 2018Application (18A55) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 22, 2018.
Aug 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 21, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 22, 2018.
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2018 to December 20, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 20, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Guadalupe Chaidez Campos
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States