No. 18-225
Title:Zappos.com, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Theresa Stevens, et al.
Docketed:August 22, 2018
Linked with 18A13
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16860)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2018Application (18A13) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 19, 2018 to August 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 02 2018Application (18A13) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 20, 2018.
Aug 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 21, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 22, 2018.
Sep 21 2018Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2018 to November 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 6, 2018.
Nov 06 2018Brief of respondents Theresa Stevens, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Zappos.com, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ben Barnow
    Counsel of Record
Barnow and Associates, P.C.
1 North LaSalle Street
Suite 4600
Chicago, IL 60602

b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
312-621-2000
Party name: Theresa Stevens, et al.
Other
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Retail Federation