No. 18-212
Title:Bank of America, N.A., Petitioner
v.
Donald M. Lusnak
Docketed:August 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-56755)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 16, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 17, 2018 to October 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 21 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent.
Main Document
Aug 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 17, 2018.
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of The Bank Policy Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: Bank of America, N.A.
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Issacharoff
    Counsel of Record
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012

si13@nyu.edu
2129986580
Party name: Donald Lusnak
Other
Matthew A. Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan and Cromwell LLP
125 Brand Street
New York, NY 10004

schwartzmatthew@sullcrom.com
(212) 558-4000
Party name: The Bank Policy Institute, American Bankers Association, Consumer Bankers Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and Mortgage Bankers Association