No. 18-2
Vide 17-1703
Title:Natural Resources Defense Council, Petitioner
v.
Mexichem Fluor, Inc., et al.
Docketed:June 28, 2018
Linked with 17A981
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1328, 15-1329)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2018Application (17A981) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 26, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 16 2018Application (17A981) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 25, 2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 30, 2018)
AppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2018Corrected petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Main DocumentOther
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Jul 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 30, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018, for all respondents.
Jul 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 30, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Carrier Corporation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Daikin U.S. Corporation filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Brief of respondents Mexichem Flour, Inc. and Arkema Inc. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Brief of respondent Environmental Protection Agency in opposition filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 11 2018Reply of petitioner Natural Resources Defense Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Daniel Doniger
    Counsel of Record
Natural Resources Defense Council
1152 15th St., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

ddoniger@nrdc.org
2022896868
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency
Dan Himmelfarb
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
202 263 3035
Party name: Arkema Inc.
Other
Megan Marie Herzog
    Counsel of Record
Massachusetts Office of the Attorney General
One Ashburton Place, 18th Floor
Boston, MA 02108

megan.herzog@state.ma.us
617-727-2200
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
Scott Howard Segal
    Counsel of Record
Bracewell, LLP
2001 M Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20036

scott.segal@bracewell.com
202-828-5845
Party name: Carrier Corporation, et al.
Mark Victor Stanga
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
Dakin U.S. Corporation
601 13th St., N.W., Ste. 200 South
Washington, DC 20005

mstanga@verizon.net
202-669-2002
Party name: Daikin U.S. Corporation