No. 18-192
Title:J. B. R., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-20262)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 24, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2018 to October 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 15, 2018.
Oct 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2018 to December 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 21, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Mills Legal Clinic
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: J. B. R.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States