No. 18-188
Title:Ivy T. Tucker, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4182)
   Decision Date:May 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 29 2018Response Requested. (Due September 28, 2018)
Sep 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2018 to October 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ilana Beth Gelfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
100 High Street
Boston, MA 02110

igelfman@jonesday.com
(617) 960-3939
Party name: Ivy Tucker
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States