No. 18-175
Title:Applied Underwriters, Inc., et al., Petitioner
v.
Citizens of Humanity, LLC, et al.
Docketed:August 8, 2018
Linked with 17A1315
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B276601)
   Decision Date:November 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 14, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 25 2018Application (17A1315) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 12, 2018 to August 11, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 29 2018Application (17A1315) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 11, 2018.
Aug 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Brief of respondents Citizens of Humanity, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioners Applied Underwriters, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

cliff.sloan@skadden.com
202-371-7040
Party name: Applied Underwriters, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Warren David Postman
    Counsel of Record
Keller Lenkner
1300 I Street NW
Suite 400E
Washington, DC 20005

wdp@kellerlenkner.com
2027498334
Party name: Citizens of Humanity, et al.