No. 18-174
Title:Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Citizens of Humanity, LLC, et al.
Docketed:August 8, 2018
Linked with 17A1378
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-17-178)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2018Application (17A1378) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 5, 2018 to August 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 18 2018Application (17A1378) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 4, 2018.
Aug 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Brief of respondents Citizens of Humanity, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioner Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

cliff.sloan@skadden.com
202-371-7040
Party name: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Warren David Postman
    Counsel of Record
Keller Lenkner
1300 I Street NW
Suite 400E
Washington, DC 20005

wdp@kellerlenkner.com
2027498334
Party name: Citizens of Humanity, et al.