No. 18-164
Title:First Solar, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Mineworkers' Pension Scheme, et al.
Docketed:August 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-17282)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief of respondents Mineworkers' Pension Scheme, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Sep 19 2018Reply of petitioners First Solar, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5600
Party name: First Solar, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Susan K. Alexander
    Counsel of Record
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800
San Francisco, CA 94104

salexander@rgrdlaw.com
4152884545
Party name: Mineworkers' Pension Scheme, et al.
Other
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al.