No. 18-162
Title:Elzie Ball, et al., Petitioners
v.
James M. LeBlanc, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, et al.
Docketed:August 6, 2018
Linked with 17A1307
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30052)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2018Application (17A1307) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 7, 2018 to August 6, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 29 2018Application (17A1307) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 9, 2018.
Jun 28 2018Application (17A1307) to extend further the time from July 9, 2018 to August 6, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jul 06 2018Application (17A1307) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 6, 2018.
Aug 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2018Waiver of right of respondents James M. LeBlanc, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 23 2018Response Requested. (Due September 24, 2018)
Sep 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 24, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Elzie Ball, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Colin Andrew Clark
    Counsel of Record
Louisiana Department of Justice
1885 N. Third Street, PO Box 94005
Second Floor
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

clarkc@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6200
Party name: James M. LeBlanc, et al.