No. 18-1584
Vide 18-1587
Title:United States Forest Service, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al.
Docketed:June 26, 2019
Linked with 18A1182
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1144)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2019Application (18A1182) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2019 to June 25, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2019Application (18A1182) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 25, 2019.
Jun 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2019 .
Jul 25 2019Brief amici curiae of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of The United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2019Brief amici curiae of American Forest Resource Council et al filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief of respondents Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 11 2019Reply of petitoner Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Reply of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2019Reply of petitioner United States Forest Service, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 04 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-1587 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Oct 04 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-1584. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-1584. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 11 2019Blanket Consent filed by respondents, Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al. VIDED.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Blanket Consent
Nov 05 2019Brief amicus curiae of Richard James Pierce Jr., in support of neither party filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Motion for an extension of time filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Nov 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including December 2, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 15, 2020. VIDED
Dec 02 2019Brief of Federal Petitioners filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 02 2019Brief of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Joint Appendix submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Forest Service, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Cowpasture River Preservation Association, et al.
Other
Ellen O. Boardman
    Counsel of Record
O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue
5301 Wisconsin Avenue, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20015

eboardman@odonoghuelaw.com
2023620041
Party name: United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of The United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al.
John Charles Cruden
    Counsel of Record
Beveridge & Diamond PC
1350 I Street, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005

jcruden@bdlaw.com
2027896000
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Lawson Emmett Fite
    Counsel of Record
700 N.E. Multnomah, Ste. 320
Portland, OR 97232

lfite@amforest.org
5032229505
Party name: American Forest Resource Council, et al.
Thomas Christian Jensen
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

tjensen@perkinscoie.com
(703) 304-5211
Party name: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Richard James Pierce Jr.
    Counsel of Record
george washington university
school of law, 2000 H Street,
Washington, DC 20052

rpierce@law.gwu.edu
7033041623
Party name: Richard James Pierce Jr.