No. 18-1567 | |
Title: | Alexander A. Benzemann, Petitioner v. Houslanger & Associates, PLLC, et al. |
Docketed: | June 24, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-1162-cv) |
Decision Date: | May 13, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 20 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 07 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew Lloyd Tiajoloff Counsel of Record | Tiajoloff & Kelly LLP Chrysler Building, 37th floor, 405 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10174 Atiajoloff@tkiplaw.com | 212-490-3285 |
Party name: Alexander Benzemann |