No. 18-1566
Title:Charles D. Scoville, Petitioner
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:June 21, 2019
Linked with 18A1057
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4059)
   Decision Date:January 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 11 2019Application (18A1057) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2019 to May 24, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 16 2019Application (18A1057) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 24, 2019.
May 09 2019Application (18A1057) to extend further the time from May 24, 2019 to June 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 09 2019Application (18A1057) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 21, 2019.
Jun 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 22, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 22, 2019 to August 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2019.
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Securities Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2019 to September 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 20, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Sievert Williams
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
725 Twelfth Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jwilliams@wc.com
202-434-5646
Party name: Charles D. Scoville
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Matthew A. Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

schwartzmatthew@sullcrom.com
(212) 558-4000
Party name: Joseph Grundfest, Todd Henderson, Jonathan Macey, Richard W. Painter, and Adam C. Pritchard