No. 18-1541
Title:Yassine Baouch, et al., Petitioners
v.
Werner Enterprises, Inc., dba Werner Trucking, et al.
Docketed:June 13, 2019
Linked with 18A917
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1661)
   Decision Date:November 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 21, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2019Application (18A917) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 21, 2019 to April 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Mar 12 2019Application (18A917) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until April 20, 2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2019Brief of respondents Werner Enterprises, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 29 2019Reply of petitioners Yassine Baouch, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Yassine Baouch, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph E. Jones
    Counsel of Record
Fraser Stryker PC LLO
500 Energy Plaza
409 South 17th Street
Omaha, NE 68102

jjones@fraserstryker.com
4023416000
Party name: Werner Enterprises, Inc., et al.