No. 18-1539
Title:Domino's Pizza, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Guillermo Robles
Docketed:June 13, 2019
Linked with 18A906
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55504)
   Decision Date:January 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2019Application (18A906) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 15, 2019 to June 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Mar 06 2019Application (18A906) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 14, 2019.
Jun 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2019 to August 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 14, 2019.
Jul 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Restaurant Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019Brief of respondent Guillermo Robles in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Domino's Pizza, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Joseph R. Manning Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Manning Law, APC
20062 S.W. Birch St., Ste 200
Newport Beach, CA 92660

disabilityrights@ManningLawOffice.com
949-200-8755
Party name: Guillermo Robles
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-463-5337
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
John Bruce Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
127 Public Square, Suite 2000
Key Tower
Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

jlewis@bakerlaw.com
216-621-0200
Party name: Restaurant Law Center
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4100
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and National Retail Federation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute