No. 18-1530
Title:Enplas Display Device Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd.
Docketed:June 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2599)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 13, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Waiver of right of respondent Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 09 2019Response Requested. (Due September 9, 2019)
Sep 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2019 to September 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 19, 2019.
Sep 19 2019Brief of respondent Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Reply of petitioner Enplas Display Device Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Christopher Rozendaal
    Counsel of Record
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox, PLLC
1100 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jcrozendaal@sternekessler.com
(202) 772-8747
Party name: Enplas Display Device Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Lawrence J. GottsLatham and Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

lawrence.gotts@lw.com
2026372384
Party name: Seoul Semiconductor Company, Ltd.