No. 18-153
Title:Louisiana Public Service Commission, Petitioner
v.
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al.
Docketed:August 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1382)
   Decision Date:March 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 4, 2018 to October 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Arkansas Public Service Commission in support of respondent filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 4, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Fontham
    Counsel of Record
Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, LLC
909 Poydras Street, Suite 3150
New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

Mfontham@stonepigman.com
5045930810
Party name: Louisiana Public Service Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Other
Dennis Lane
    Counsel of Record
Stinson Leonard Street LLP
1775 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006-4605

dennis.lane@stinson.com
202-785-9100
Party name: Arkansas Public Service Commission