No. 18-1516
Title:Veronica Price, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Chicago, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:June 6, 2019
Linked with 18A1114
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2196)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2019Application (18A1114) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 14, 2019 to June 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 29 2019Application (18A1114) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until June 4, 2019.
Jun 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Veronica Price, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 8, 2019 to August 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 7, 2019.
Jul 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amici curiae of 40 Days for Life & Sidewalk Advocates for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amici curiae of American Civil Rights Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amici curiae of American Family Association and Dr. Alveda King filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Brief of respondents City of Chicago, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 21 2019Reply of petitioners Veronica Price, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas Gerald Olp
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 West Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tolp@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Veronica Price, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Benna Ruth Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
30 N. LaSalle St., Ste. 800
Chicago, IL 60602

benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
312.744.7764
Party name: City of Chicago, et al.
Other
Brennan Tyler Brooks
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of B. Tyler Brooks, PLLC
5540 Centerview Drive, Suite 200
Raleigh, NC 27606

btb@btylerbrookslawyer.com
336-707-8855
Party name: American Family Association
Brennan Tyler Brooks
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of B. Tyler Brooks, PLLC
5540 Centerview Drive, Suite 200
Raleigh, NC 27606

btb@btylerbrookslawyer.com
336-707-8855
Party name: Dr. Alveda King
Brennan Tyler Brooks
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of B. Tyler Brooks, PLLC
5540 Centerview Drive, Suite 200
Raleigh, NC 27606

btb@btylerbrookslawyer.com
336-707-8855
Party name: American Family Association and Dr. Alveda King
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
Suite 208
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-283-8880
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund
Rachel Nicole Morrison
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

rachel.morrison@aul.org
202-741-4902
Party name: 40 Days for Life & Sidewalk Advocates for Life
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Suite 2200
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Civil Rights Union and Students for Life of America
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(757)226-2749
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al.