No. 18-1513
Title:Michigan, Petitioner
v.
Michael Frederick, et al.
Docketed:June 5, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(341741, 341742)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 5, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 03 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Brief of respondents Michael Frederick, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Kevin Benison
    Counsel of Record
Kent County Prosecutor's Office
82 Ionia Avenue NW - Suite 450
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

james.benison@kentcountymi.gov
(616) 632-6710
Party name: Michigan
Attorneys for Respondents
Bruce Alan Block
    Counsel of Record
Bruce Alan Block, PLC
1155 East Paris Ave SE Ste 300
Grand Rapids, MI 49546

bblock@bablock.com
6166768770
Party name: Michael Frederick, et al.