No. 18-1501
Title:Charles C. Liu, et al., Petitioners
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:June 3, 2019
Linked with 18A958
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55849)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2019Application (18A958) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 3, 2019 to May 31, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Application (18A958) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 31, 2019.
May 31 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 13 2019Waiver of right of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 05 2019Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2019)
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2019 to September 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2019.
Sep 04 2019Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Sep 18 2019Reply of petitioners Charles C. Liu, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 01 2019Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7902
Party name: Charles C. Liu, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission