No. 18-1498
Title:UnitedHealth Group Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Louis J. Peterson, on Behalf of Patients E, I, K, L, N, P, Q, and R, et al.
Docketed:May 31, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1744)
   Decision Date:January 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2019 to July 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 31, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 31, 2019 to August 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 30, 2019.
Aug 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2019 to October 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 1, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory Frederick Jacob
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

gjacob@omm.com
(202) 383-5300
Party name: UnitedHealth Group Inc.,, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Nathan Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

agoldfarb@zuckerman.com
2027781822
Party name: Louis J. Peterson, D.C., et al.