No. 18-1492
Title:Katherine Miller, Petitioner
v.
Jay Inslee, Governor of Washington, et al.
Docketed:May 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35939)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 28, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Waiver of right of respondents Jay Inslee; Cheryl Strange; David Schumacher to respond filed.
Main Document
May 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent Service Employees International Union, Local 925 to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Response Requested. (Due July 18, 2019)
Jun 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2019 to August 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 26 2019Blanket Consent filed on behalf of Petitioner, and respondents.
Blanket Consent
Jul 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2019, for all respondents.
Jul 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Buckeye Institute, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Milton L. Chappell
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd
Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22060

mlc@nrtw.org
703-770-3329
Party name: Katherine Miller
Attorneys for Respondents
Callie Anne Castillo
    Counsel of Record
Washington State Attorney General's Office
1125 Washington Street SE, Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504

calliec@atg.wa.gov
360-664-0869
Party name: Jay Inslee; Cheryl Strange; David Schumacher
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Service Employees International Union, Local 925
Other
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Buckeye Institute, et al.,
Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ewilcox@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation