No. 18-1482
Title:Semyya Lanise Cunningham, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 29, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4664)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2019 to July 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 29, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Reply of petitioner Semyya Lanise Cunningham filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Marcus McNichols
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twellth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

jmcnichols@wc.com
202-434-5043
Party name: Semyya Lanise Cunningham
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States