No. 18-1475
Vide 18-1334, 18-1496, 18-1514, 18-1521
Title:Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al.
Docketed:May 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1671, 18-1746, 18-1787)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 7, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 27, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 10 2019Letter of June 10, 2019 from the Solicitor General filed.
Main Document
Jun 10 2019Waiver of right of respondents Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All Title III Debtors (Other than COFINA) to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 11 2019Waiver of right of respondent Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”) to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 12 2019Letter of June 12, 2019 from counsel for petitioners filed.
Main Document
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 20 2019Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 18-1334, 18-1475, 18-1496, 18-1514 and 18-1521 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and will be set for argument in the second week of the October 2019 argument session. Parties challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue shall file an opening brief on that issue on or before Thursday, July 25, 2019. The briefs are to bear a light blue cover and are limited to 15,000 words. Parties supporting the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and challenging the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue shall file a consolidated opening brief on or before Thursday, August 22, 2019. The briefs are to bear a light red cover and are limited to 20,000 words. Parties challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and supporting the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue shall file a consolidated opening brief and reply on or before Thursday, September 19, 2019. The briefs are to bear a yellow cover and are limited to 13,000 words. Parties challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue shall file with the Clerk and serve upon counsel a reply brief limited to that issue on or before 2 p.m., Tuesday, October 8, 2019. The briefs are to bear a tan cover and are limited to 6,000 words. Amicus curiae briefs challenging the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and/or supporting the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue are to be filed on or before Thursday, August 1, 2019. The briefs are to bear a light green cover and are limited to 9,000 words. Amicus curiae briefs supporting the First Circuit’s ruling on the Appointments Clause issue and/or challenging the ruling on the de facto officer doctrine issue are to be filed on or before Thursday, August 29, 2019. The briefs are to bear a dark green cover and are limited to 9,000 words. An amicus curiae shall file only a single brief.
Jun 20 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-1334. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-1334. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the fling is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 15, 2019. VIDED
Aug 01 2019CIRCULATED
Aug 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Aug 26 2019The record from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is located on PACER, with the exception of the appendix located electronically.
Aug 29 2019Record received from the U.S.D.C. District of Puerto Rico is electronic. All other non confidential filings are located on PACER.
Oct 15 2019Argued. For Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Washington, D. C. For United States: Jeffrey B. Wall, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Aurelius Investment, LLC, et al.: Theodore B. Olson, Washington, D. C. For UTIER: Jessica E. Méndez-Colberg, Ponce, P. R. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: Aurelius Investment LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jessica Esther Mendez
    Counsel of Record
Bufete Emmanuelli, C.S.P.
P.O. Box 10779
Ponce, PR 00732

jessica@bufete-emmanuelli.com
787-848-0666
Party name: Unión de Trabajadores de la Industria Eléctrica y Riego, Inc. (“UTIER”)
Neal David Mollen
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

nealmollen@paulhastings.com
202-551-1738
Party name: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All Title III Debtors (Other than COFINA)
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Finanical Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Other
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
    Counsel of Record
ACLU
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2400

ACepedaDerieux@aclu.org
2125492500
Party name: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION AND THE ACLU OF PUERTO RICO