No. 18-1469
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Casa de Maryland, et al.
Docketed:May 24, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1521, 18-1522)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
May 24 2019Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 28 2019Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 29 2019Response to motion to expedite from respondents Casa de Maryland, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioners DENIED.
Jun 24 2019Brief of respondents Casa de Maryland, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 10 2019Reply of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John Arak Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Mass. Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

John.Freedman@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5316
Party name: Casa de Maryland, et al.
Other
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute