No. 18-1465
Title:County of San Diego, California, Petitioner
v.
Mark Mann, et al.
Docketed:May 24, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56657, 16-56740)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 21, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Brief of respondents Mark Mann, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Reply of petitioner County of San Diego filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Dale Bunton
    Counsel of Record
Office of County Counsel
1600 Pacific Highway
Room 355
San Diego, CA 92101

thomas.bunton@sdcounty.ca.gov
619-531-4871
Party name: County of San Diego
Attorneys for Respondents
Donnie R. Cox
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Donnie R. Cox
402 North Nevada Street
Oceanside, CA 92054

drc@drcoxlaw.com
760-400-0263
Party name: Mark Mann, et al.