No. 18-1460
Vide 18-1323
Title:Stephen Russo, Interim Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, Petitioner
v.
June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.
Docketed:May 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30397)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 24, 2019 to August 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2019.
Jun 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Senator Josh Hawley filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Amicus brief of 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Hurt By Abortion and The Justice Foundation not accepted for filing. (June 24, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Jun 24 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Amicus brief of American Center for Law and Justice not accepted for filing. (June 27, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Jun 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Brief amici curiae of 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Hurt By Abortion and The Justice Foundation filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief of respondents June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2019Reply of petitioner Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 04 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-1323 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Oct 04 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-1323. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-1323. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Nov 26 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 4, 2020. VIDED.
Jan 09 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Jan 10 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Jan 21 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 04 2020Argued. For June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.: Julie Rikelman, New York, N. Y. For Stephen Russo, Interim Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals: Elizabeth Murrill, Solicitor General, Baton Rouge, La.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Stephen Russo, Interim Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals
Attorneys for Respondents
Travis J. Tu
    Counsel of Record
The Center for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street
New York, NY 10038

tjtu@reprorights.org
9176373627
Party name: June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave Ste. 500
Washington, DC 20036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
2027414917
Party name: Americans United for Life
Harold J. Cassidy
    Counsel of Record
The Cassidy Law Firm
750 Broad Street
Shrewsbury, NJ 07702

hjc@haroldcassidy.com
7327473999
Party name: National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, Alpha Center, Heartbeat International, Inc., Care Net, Caring to Love Ministries, and Louisiana Alliance For Life
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
University of St. Thomas School of Law Prolife Center
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55403

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: Concerned Women for America & Charlotte Lozier Institute
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
302 West Washington Street
IGC South, Fifth Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46205

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana, et al.
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission and Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod
Claudia Lesley Hammerman
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

chammerman@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Michele Coleman Mayes, Claudia Hammerman, et al.
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: State of Texas
Joshua David Hawley
    Counsel of Record
N/A
212 Russell Senate Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20510

ellen_james@hawley.senate.gov
202-224-6154
Party name: Senator Josh Hawley
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: Former Federal Officials
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Hurt By Abortion and The Justice Foundation
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202-546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Reed Neal Smith
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd
Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

rsmith@clsnet.org
7038941081
Party name: Christian Legal Society et al.
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Independence Law Center