No. 18-1455
Title:Archdiocese of Washington, Petitioner
v.
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, et al.
Docketed:May 22, 2019
Linked with 18A880
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7171)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 21, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2019Application (18A880) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 21, 2019 to April 20, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 01 2019Application (18A880) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 20, 2019.
Mar 21 2019Application (18A880) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 20, 2019 to May 20, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Application (18A880) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 20, 2019.
May 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Archdiocese of Washington, a corporation sole.
Blanket Consent
Jun 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2019 to July 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 22, 2019.
Jun 20 2019Amicus brief of Foundation for Moral Law not accepted for filing. (Corrected version to be submitted -- June 20, 2019)
Jun 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2019Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Evangelicals, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Brief of respondents Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2019Reply of petitioner Archdiocese of Washington, a corporation sole filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Archdiocese of Washington, a corporation sole
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, et al.
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals, et al.
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, et al.
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law