No. 18-1449 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Harold Lee Harvey, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:May 21, 2019
Linked with 18A905
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-790)
   Decision Date:November 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2018Application (18A905) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 19, 2019.
Mar 06 2019Application (18A905) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 20, 2019 to May 19, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 20, 2019)
Petition
Jun 19 2019Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOtherProof of Service
Jul 02 2019Reply of petitioner Harold Lee Harvey, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ross Benjamin Bricker
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

RBricker@jenner.com
312-222-9350
Party name: Harold Lee Harvey, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: Florida