No. 18-1435 | |
Title: | Matthew Wayne Minard, Individually and in His Official Capacity as a Taylor Police Officer, Petitioner v. Debra Lee Cruise-Gulyas |
Docketed: | May 15, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-2196) |
Decision Date: | March 13, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 29 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2019) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 04 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Debra Lee Cruise-Gulyas to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 26 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Mark W. Peyser Counsel of Record | Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC 450 W. 4th Street Royal Oak, MI 48067 MWP@H2law.com | 248-723-0356 |
Party name: Matthew W. Minard | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Hammad A. Khan | Blackstone Law, PLLC 1 Ajax Drive, Ste. #101 Madison Heights, MI 48071 | 248-951-8111 |
Party name: Debra Lee Cruise-Gulyas |