No. 18-1432
Title:Nidal Khalid Nasrallah, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:May 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13105)
   Decision Date:February 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jun 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 14, 2019 to July 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Jun 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 15, 2019.
Jul 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2019 to August 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Jul 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 14, 2019.
Aug 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 14, 2019 to September 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 9, 2019.
Sep 09 2019Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main Document
Sep 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Sep 25 2019Reply of petitioner Nidal Khalid Nasrallah filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 18 2019Petition GRANTED.
Oct 18 2019As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Nov 18 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 9, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 15, 2020.
Nov 26 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 2, 2020.
Dec 09 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Brief of petitioner Nidal Khalid Nasrallah filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office of Immigration Review Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Legal Service Providers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Jan 15 2020Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 21 2020CIRCULATED
Jan 22 2020the record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER
Feb 14 2020Reply of petitioner Nidal Khalid Nasrallah filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Argued. For petitioner: Paul Hughes, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Matthew Guarnieri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Mar 10 2020Sealed documents was requested and received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit. The documents are electronically filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Nidal Khalid Nasrallah
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William P. Barr, Attorney General
Other
Holly Lee Henderson-Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
Four Times Square
New York, NY 10036

holly.henderson@skadden.com
212-735-3073
Party name: Law Professors
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-3818
Party name: Former Executive Office of Immigration Review Judges
Charles G. Roth
    Counsel of Record
National Immigration Justice Center
224 S. Michigan Ave., Ste. 600
Chicago, IL 60604

croth@heartlandalliance.org
3126601613
Party name: Legal Service Providers