No. 18-1424
Title:Michael N. Thomas, Petitioner
v.
Raymond Anderson, et al.
Docketed:May 15, 2019
Linked with 18A986
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2830)
   Decision Date:November 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 27 2019Application (18A986) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 11, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2019Application (18A986) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until May 13, 2019.
May 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019Waiver of right of respondents Raymond Anderson, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 31 2019Response Requested. (Due August 30, 2019)
Aug 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2019 to September 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifford Warren Berlow
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

cberlow@jenner.com
312-840-7366
Party name: Michael N. Thomas
Attorneys for Respondents
Frank Henry Bieszczat
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Illinois Attorney General
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

fbieszczat@atg.state.il.us
312-814-2234
Party name: Raymond Anderson, et al.