No. 18-1421
Title:Nassau County District Attorney's Office, Petitioner
v.
Mark Orlando
Docketed:May 14, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2390)
   Decision Date:February 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2019Waiver of right of respondent Mark Orlando to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 24 2019Response Requested. (Due August 23, 2019)
Aug 20 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Mark Orlando.
Main Document
Aug 20 2019Brief of respondent Mark Orlando in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 18 2019Reply of petitioner Nassau County District Attorney's Office filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Sep 26 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 08 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 17 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 30 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 06 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 13 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 20 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 03 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 09 2019Rescheduled.
Jan 06 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 08 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 16 2020Rescheduled.
Jan 21 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 22 2020Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tammy Jennifer Smiley
    Counsel of Record
Nassau County District Attorney's Office
262 Old Country Road
Mineola, NY 11501

tammy.smiley@nassauda.org
(516) 571-3800
Party name: Nassau County District Attorney's Office
Attorneys for Respondent
Jane Simkin Smith
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 1277
Millbrook, NY 12545

jssmith1@optonline.net
8457243415
Party name: Mark Orlando