No. 18-1401
Title:David D. Peterson, Petitioner
v.
Linear Controls, Inc.
Docketed:May 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30790)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 6, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Waiver of right of respondent Linear Controls Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Brian Wolfman, Aderson Francois, Eric Schnapper filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 05 2019Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2019)
Jul 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2019 to September 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 10, 2019.
Sep 10 2019Brief of respondent Linear Controls Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: David D. Peterson
Attorneys for Respondent
William S. Helfand
    Counsel of Record
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith
24 Greenway Plaza
Suite 1400
Houston, TX 77046

bill.helfand@lewisbrisbois.com
713-659-6767
Party name: Linear Controls Inc.
Other
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Brian Wolfman, Aderson Francois, Eric Schnapper