No. 18-1386
Title:Dan M. Lipschultz, In His Official Capacity as Commissioner of the Minnesota Public Utilities Commission, et al., Petitioners
v.
Charter Advanced Services (MN), LLC, et al.
Docketed:May 3, 2019
Linked with 18A889
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2290)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 22 2019Application (18A889) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 4, 2019 to May 3, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 01 2019Application (18A889) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until May 3, 2019.
May 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2019 to July 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 3, 2019.
Jun 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Regulatory Utility Commissioners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief of respondents Charter Advanced Services (MN) LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Reply of petitioners Dan M. Lipschultz, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
6517571010
Party name: Dan M. Lipschultz, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Charter Advanced Services (MN) LLC, et al.
Other
James Bradford Ramsay
    Counsel of Record
1101 Vermont Avenue NW Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

jramsay@naruc.org
2028981350
Party name: National Association of Regulatory Utility Commissioners