No. 18-1382
Title:American Eagle Express, Inc., dba AEX Group, Petitioner
v.
Ever Bedoya, et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1641)
   Decision Date:January 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2019Waiver of right of respondents EVER BEDOYA, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jun 28 2019Response Requested. (Due July 29, 2019)
Jul 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2019.
Aug 28 2019Brief of respondents Ever Bedoya, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 11 2019Reply of petitioner American Eagle Express, Inc., dba AEX Group filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Charles DeBlasio
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Lewis P.C.
766 Shrewsbury Avenue, Suite 101
Tinton Falls, NJ 07724

joseph.deblasio@jacksonlewis.com
732-532-6148
Party name: American Eagle Express, Inc., dba AEX Group
Attorneys for Respondents
Harold Louis Lichten
    Counsel of Record
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000
Boston, MA 02116

hlichten@llrlaw.com
617-994-5800
Party name: Ever Bedoya, et al.