No. 18-1372 Vide 18-1366 | |
Title: | City of Newark, New Jersey, Petitioner v. Estate of Adriano Roman, Jr. |
Docketed: | May 1, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-2302) |
Decision Date: | January 29, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 29 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2019 to July 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 17 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2019. |
Jul 01 2019 | Brief of respondent Estate of Adriano Roman, Jr. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 15 2019 | Reply of petitioner City of Newark filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 17 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Wilson David Antoine II Counsel of Record | City of Newark - Law Department 920 Broad Street, Room 316 Newark, NJ 07102 antoinew@ci.newark.nj.us | 9737333114 |
Party name: City of Newark | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Justin Daniel Santagata Counsel of Record | Kaufman Semeraro & Leibman, LLP 2 Executive Drive, Suite 530 Fort Lee, NJ 07024 jsantagata@northjerseyattorneys.com | 2019478855 |
Party name: Estate of Adriano Roman, Jr. |