No. 18-1367
Title:Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Petitioner
v.
Mark A. Sumner
Docketed:April 30, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(180121)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2019Waiver of right of respondent Mark A. Summer to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 05 2019Response Requested. (Due July 5, 2019)
Jun 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2019 to August 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2019.
Aug 05 2019Brief of respondent Mark A. Summer in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Willard James Moody Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Moody Law Firm, Inc.
500 Crawford Street
Suite 200
Portsmouth, VA 23704

will@moodyrrlaw.com
757-393-4093
Party name: Mark A. Summer
Michael R. DavisThe Moody Law Firm, Inc.
500 Crawford Street, Suite 200
Portsmouth, VA 23704

757-393-4093
Party name: Mark A. Summer