No. 18-1362
Title:James Hall, Petitioner
v.
John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State
Docketed:April 30, 2019
Linked with 18A909
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16766)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2019Application (18A909) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 13, 2019 to May 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Mar 08 2019Application (18A909) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 12, 2019.
Apr 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
May 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 30, 2019 to June 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2019.
May 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Coalition for Free and Open Elections filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 13 2019Motion of Secretary, State of Alabama for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David I. Schoen
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
2800 Zelda Road
Suite 100-6
Montgomery, AL 36106

DSchoen593@aol.com
(334)-395-6611
Party name: James Hall
Attorneys for Respondent
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
P.O. Box 300152
Montgomery, AL 36130

elacour@ago.state.al.us
334-353-2196
Party name: Secretary, State of Alabama
Other
Colleen Elizabeth Roh Sinzdak
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells LLP
555 13th Street NW
Washington, DC 20004

colleen.sinzdak@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5823
Party name: The Coalition for Free and Open Elections