No. 18-1323
Vide 18-1460
Title:June Medical Services L.L.C., et al., Petitioners
v.
Stephen Russo, Interim Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals
Docketed:April 19, 2019
Linked with 18A774
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30397)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2019Application (18A774) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 29 2019Response to application (18A774) requested by Justice Alito, due Thursday, January 31, 2019, by 3:00 p.m. ET.
Jan 31 2019Response to application from respondent Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2019Reply of applicants June Medical Services, L.L.C., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Because the filings regarding the application for a stay in this matter were not completed until earlier today and the Justices need time to review these filings, the issuance of the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, case No. 17-30397, is administratively stayed through Thursday, February 7, 2019. This order does not reflect any view regarding the merits of the petition for a writ of certiorari that applicants represent they will file.
Feb 07 2019Application (18A774) referred to the Court.
Feb 07 2019Application (18A774) granted by the Court. The application for a stay presented to JUSTICE ALITO and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in case No. 17-30397 is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. JUSTICE THOMAS, JUSTICE ALITO, JUSTICE GORSUCH, and JUSTICE KAVANAUGH would deny the application. JUSTICE KAVANAUGH, dissenting from grant of application for stay. (Detached Opinion)
Apr 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2019 to July 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 19, 2019.
May 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Judges and Department of Justice Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2019Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Senator Josh Hawley in support of respondent filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Amicus brief of 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Injured By Abortion and The Justice Foundation not accepted for filing. (June 27, 2019)
Jul 19 2019Brief of respondent Rebekah Gee, Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Reply of petitioners June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 04 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-1460 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Oct 04 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-1323. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-1323. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 15 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Oct 22 2019Upon consideration of the joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits, petitioners in No. 18-1323 shall file an opening brief limited to the questions presented in its petition on or before Monday, November 25, 2019. The brief is to bear a light blue cover and is limited to 13,000 words. Respondent in No. 18-1323 shall file a consolidated opening brief on the questions presented in both cases on or before Thursday, December 26, 2019. The brief is to bear a light red cover and is limited to 21,500 words. Petitioners in No. 18-1323 shall file consolidated opening brief and reply on or before Friday, January 17, 2020. The brief is to bear a yellow cover and is limited to 14,500 words. Respondent in No. 18-1323 shall file with the Clerk and serve upon counsel a reply brief, limited to the questions presented in its petition, on or before 2 p.m., Tuesday, February 18, 2020. The brief is to bear a tan cover and is limited to 6,000 words. Amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners in No. 18-1323 on all or any of the questions presented, or in support of neither party, are to be filed on or before Monday, December 2, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs in support of respondent in No. 18-1323 are to be filed on or before Thursday, January 2, 2020. An amicus curiae shall file only a single brief in these cases. VIDED.
Oct 24 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Nov 06 2019Motion for leave to file the joint appendix pursuant to Rule 33.2 filed by petitioners June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Addendum to motion to file the joint appendix pursuant to Rule 33.2 (for leave to file one volume under seal) filed. (November 13, 20190. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Rebekah Gee. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Nov 18 2019Motion for leave to file the joint appendix pursuant to Rule 33.2 with one volume under seal GRANTED.
Nov 25 2019Brief of petitioners June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Joint appendix filed (7 volumes & 1 sealed volume). VIDED.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Nov 26 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 4, 2020. VIDED.
Dec 02 2019Amicus brief of National Health Law Program, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected electronic version submitted).
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of National Health Law Program, et al. filed. (December 3, 2019). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Amicus brief of Organizations And Individuals Dedicated To The Fight For Reproductive Justice – Women With A Vision et al. not accepted for filing. (December 04, 2019 -- Corrected brief to be submitted)
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Organizations And Individuals Dedicated To The Fight For Reproductive Justice – Women With A Vision et al. filed. (December 5, 2019). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Judges and Department of Justice Officials filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Amicus brief of LGBTQ Organizations not accepted for filing. (Corrected electronic version to be submitted - December 3, 2019).
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of LGBTQ Organizations filed (in 18-1323). (December 3, 2019). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Ibis Reproductive Health and Other Organizations filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center and 72 Additional Organizations Committed to Equality and Economic Opportunity for Women filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Reproductive Justice Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Social Science Researchers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of 197 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Holly Alvarado, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union and The ACLU of Louisiana filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of Information Society Project at Yale Law School filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Whole Woman's Health and Whole Woman's Health Alliance filed (in 18-1460).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Tort Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of If/When/How: Lawyering For Reproductive Justice, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Michele Coleman Mayes, Claudia Hammerman, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of States of New York, et al filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Catholics for Choice, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Planned Parenthood Federation of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Feminist Majority Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Medical Staff Professionals filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Lodging proposal of amici curiae Social Science Researchers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Consolidated opening brief of Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Dept. of Health and Hospitals filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of State of Idaho filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Request to lodge pursuant to Rule 32.3 of Rebekah Gee not accepted for filing. (January 09, 2020).
Dec 26 2019Motion to supplement the record and to file certain documents under seal filed by Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals. VIDED.
Main Document
Dec 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Legal Center for Defense of Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Priests for Life and Rachel's Vineyard filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Louisiana Family Forum, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Concerned Women for America & Charlotte Lozier Institute filed (in 18-1460).
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Senator Josh Hawley filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amici curiae of US Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of State of Texas filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Attorney Mary J. Browning filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Family Research Council filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amici curiae of National Right to Life Committee, et al. filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Inner Life Fund and The Institute for Faith and Family filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amici curiae of 2,624 Women Injured By Abortion, Operation Outcry, and The Justice Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Melinda Thybault, Founder of The Moral Outcry Petition, Individually and Acting on Behalf of 264,500 Signers of The Moral Outcry Petition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of African American Prolife Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 02 2020Amicus brief of Illinois Right to Life not accepted for filing. (To be reprinted - January 03, 2020)
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Illinois Right to Life filed. (January 8, 2020). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 02 2020Amicus brief of International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers not accepted for filing. (January 28, 2020). (Corrected version submitted)
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers filed (in 18-1323). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Arkansas, Indiana, et al filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission and Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of 207 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Susan B. Anthony List filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Operation Rescue and The National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Independence Law Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Pro-Life Legal Defense Fund, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Right to Life of Michigan filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Abby Johnson and Terry Beatley filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed (in 18-1460).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 02 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law & Justice, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, et al. filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain DocumentOther
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Abortion Providers; The National Association of Catholic Nurses, USA; and the Association of Catholic Bioethics Center filed (in 18-1323). (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Louisiana State Legislators filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Samaritan's Purse, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Response to motion to enlarge the record from petitioners June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 09 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Jan 10 2020The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Jan 13 2020Motion to supplement the record and to file certain documents under seal DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 16 2020Joint motion for an extension of time to file briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Jan 16 2020Joint motion to extend the time to file briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the consolidated opening brief and reply of petitioners in 18-1323 is extended to and including Friday, January 24, 2020. The reply brief of respondents in 18-1323 shall be filed pursuant to Rule 25.3. VIDED.
Jan 16 2020The record from the U.S.D.C. Middle District of Louisiana is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of SEALED material that's electronic.
Jan 17 2020Motion of Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, to supplement the record and to file certain documents under seal DENIED. VIDED.
Jan 21 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. VIDED.
Jan 21 2020CIRCULATED
Jan 21 2020Consolidated opening brief (No. 18-1460) and reply (No. 18-1323) of June Medical Services L.L.C., et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Foundation for Life (in 18-1323).
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2020Letter from counsel for respondent/cross-petitioner notifying the Clerk of substitution of party filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Feb 13 2020Record received from the U.S.D.C. Middle District of Louisiana, the Record on Appeals is electronically filed.
Feb 20 2020Reply of respondent Stephen Russo filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Foundation for Life DENIED.
Mar 04 2020Argued. For June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.: Julie Rikelman, New York, N. Y. For Stephen Russo, Interim Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals: Elizabeth Murrill, Solicitor General, Baton Rouge, La.; and Jeffrey B. Wall, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) VIDED.
Jun 29 2020Judgment REVERSED. Breyer, J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered an opinion, in which Ginsburg, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Gorsuch, J., joined, in which Thomas, J., joined except as to Parts III–C and IV–F, and in which Kavanaugh, J., joined as to Parts I, II, and III. Gorsuch, J., and Kavanaugh, J., filed dissenting opinions. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Travis J. Tu
    Counsel of Record
The Center for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street
22nd Floor
New York, NY 10038

tjtu@reprorights.org
9176373627
Party name: June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.
Julie RikelmanCenter for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street
22nd Floor
New York, NY 10038

jrikelman@reprorights.org
917-637-3670
Party name: June Medical Services L.L.C., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Stephen Russo
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
2027414917
Party name: 207 Members of Congress
Sara Lyle AinsworthIf/When/How: Lawyering For Reproductive Justice
1730 Franklin Street
Suite 212
Oakland, CA 94612

sara@ifwhenhow.org
3479747337
Party name: If/When/How: Lawyering For Reproductive Justice, et al.
Andrew David Beck
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

abeck@aclu.org
212-549-2633
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union and The ACLU of Louisiana
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Right to Life Committee and Louisiana Right to Life Federation
Gretchen Ranley Borchelt
    Counsel of Record
National Women's Law Center
11 Dupont Circle NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC 20036

Gborchelt@nwlc.org
2025885180
Party name: National Women's Law Center and 72 Additional Organizations Committed to Equality and Economic Opportunity for Women
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: States of Arkansas, Indiana, et al
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Louisiana State Legislators
Harold J. Cassidy
    Counsel of Record
The Cassidy Law Firm
750 Broad Street
Suite 3
Shrewsbury, NJ 07702

hjc@haroldcassidy.com
7327473999
Party name: National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, Alpha Center, Heartbeat International, Inc., Care Net, Caring to Love Ministries, and Louisiana Alliance for Life
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Samaritan's Purse et al
Teresa Stanton Collett
    Counsel of Record
University of St. Thomas School of Law
MSL 400
1000 LaSalle Avenue
Minneapolis, MN 55403

tscollett@stthomas.edu
6512712958
Party name: Concerned Women for America & Charlotte Lozier Institute
Michael John Dell
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mdell@kramerlevin.com
212-715-9129
Party name: Holly Alvarado, Rana Barar, Julie Bindeman, Danielle Campoamor, Aislinn Canarr, J.C., Stephanie Goodell, Amy Irvin, Amber Kepperling, Kimberly O'Brien and Amanda Williams in Support of Petitioners-Cross-Respondents
Kelly M. Dermody
    Counsel of Record
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Berstein LLP
275 Battery Street
29th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

kdermody@lchb.com
(415) 956-1000
Party name: Reproductive Justice Scholars
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Ibis Reproductive Health and Other Organizations
Clarke David Forsythe
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

clarke.forsythe@aul.org
2022891478
Party name: Americans United for Life
Gary N. Frischling
    Counsel of Record
Milbank LLP
2029 Century Park East
33rd Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

gfrischling@milbank.com
424-386-4316
Party name: Tort Law Scholars
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Eugene Martin Gelernter
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Amer.icas
New York, NY 10036

emgelernter@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2553
Party name: Catholics for Choice, et al.
Alan Scott Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US, LLP
233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5900
Chicago, IL 60606-0000

alan.gilbert@dentons.com
3128767410
Party name: Social Science Researchers
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars
Linda Ceilia Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Dechert, LLP
1095 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

linda.goldstein@dechert.com
212-698-3500
Party name: Whole Woman's Health and Whole Woman's Health Alliance
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission and Lutheran Church-Missouri Synod
Adam Rabun Fast Gustafson
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, NW, Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

gustafson@boydengrayassociates.com
(202) 706-5486
Party name: African American Prolife Organizations
Claudia Lesley Hammerman
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

chammerman@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Michele Coleman Mayes, Claudia Hammerman, et al.
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: State of Texas
Joshua David Hawley
    Counsel of Record
N/A
212 Russell Senate Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20510

ellen_james@hawley.senate.gov
202-224-6154
Party name: Senator Josh Hawley
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
714-614-0401
Party name: Inner Life Fund and The Institute for Faith and Family
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
John Guyton Knepper Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John G. Knepper, LLC
P.O. Box 1512
Cheyenne, WY 82003

John@KnepperLLC.com
307-631-9469
Party name: The Susan B. Anthony List
Antony B. Kolenc
    Counsel of Record
106 S. Harwood Street
Dallas, TX 75201

akolenc@msn.com
(214) 243-1781
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, Inc.
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: Former Federal Judges and Department of Justice Officials
Janice Marie Mac Avoy
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
0ne New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

janice.macavoy@friedfrank.com
212-859-8182
Party name: Feminist Majority Foundation, National Organization for Women Foundation, Southern Poverty Law Center, Women's Law Project
Judy Perry Martinez
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
    Counsel of Record
Milanovich Law, PLLC
100 E Broadway Street, The Berkeley Room
Butte, MT 59701

aymilanovich@milanovichlaw.com
4065896856
Party name: Louisiana Family Forum, et al.
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Family Research Council
Robert Joseph Muise
    Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
PO Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI 48113

rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
7346353756
Party name: Priests for Life and Rachel's Vineyard
Tim Newton
    Counsel of Record
Murphy and Grantland, P.A.
4406-B Forest Drive
Columbia, SC 29206

tnewton@murphygrantland.com
803-782-4100
Party name: Thomas More Society
Thomas Gerald Olp
    Counsel of Record
A National Public Interest Law Firm
Thomas More Society
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tomolp@gmail.com
3127821680
Party name: Illinois Right to Life
Robert M. Palumbos
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rmpalumbos@duanemorris.com
215-979-1000
Party name: Medical Staff Professionals
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Drive
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: Attorney Mary J. Browning
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Drive
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: 2,624 Women Injured By Abortion, Operation Outcry, and The Justice Foundation
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Dr.
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2108331119
Party name: 2,556 Operation Outcry Women Injured By Abortion and The Justice Foundation
Allan E. Parker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Justice Foundation
8023 Vantage Drive
Suite 1275
San Antonio, TX 78230

aparker@txjf.org
2106147157
Party name: Melinda Thybault, Founder of The Moral Outcry Petition, Individually and Acting on Behalf of 264,500 Signers of The Moral Outcry Petition
Kimberly A. Parker
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

kimberly.parker@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al.
Jane Perkins
    Counsel of Record
National Health Law Program
200 North Greensboro Street
Suite D-13
Carrboro, NC 27510

perkins@healthlaw.org
919 968 6308
Party name: National Health Law Program, et al.
James Forrest Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third St, SW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20024

jpeterson@judicialwatch.org
2026465175
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Anthony Richard Picarello Jr.
    Counsel of Record
United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, Office of General Counsel
3211 4th Street, NE
Washignton, DC 20017

apicarello@usccb.org
202-541-3311
Party name: US Conference of Catholic Bishops
Wesley R. Powell
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

wpowell@willkie.com
2127288264
Party name: Organizations And Individuals Dedicated To The Fight For Reproductive Justice – Women With A Vision et al.
Dariely Rodriguez
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

drodriguez@lawyerscommittee.org
2026628330
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Planned Parenthood Federation of America, National Abortion Federation, Physicians for Reproductive Health, and Abortion Care Network
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Legal Center for Defense of Life
Linda Boston Schlueter
    Counsel of Record
Trinity Legal Center
1150 N. Loop 1604 W.
Suite 108-208
San Antonio, TX 78258

TLC4Linda@aol.com
210-274-5274
Party name: Former Abortion Providers; The National Association of Catholic Nurses, USA; and the Association of Catholic Bioethics Center
Arthur A. Schulcz Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Chaplains' Counsel, PLLC,
21043 Honeycreeper Pl.
Leesburg, VA 20175

art@chaplainscounsel.com
703-645-4010
Party name: International Conference of Evangelical Chaplain Endorsers
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

jsekulow@claglaw.com
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice, American Academy of Medical Ethics, American College of Pediatricians
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Abby Johnson and Terry Beatley
Priscilla J. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Reproductive Rights and Justice Clinic at Yale Law School
319 Sterling Place
Brooklyn, NY 11238

priscilla.smith@yale.edu
347-262-5177
Party name: Information Society Project at Yale Law School
Reed Neal Smith
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd
Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

rsmith@clsnet.org
7038941081
Party name: Christian Legal Society et al.
Kevin T. Snider
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Justice Institute
P.O. Box 276600
Sacramento, CA 95827-6600

ksnider@pji.org
(916) 857-6900
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Orin Samuel Snyder
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

osnyder@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

mat@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Operation Rescue and The National Hispanic Christian Leadership Conference
Claude G. Szyfer
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

cszyfer@stroock.com
(212) 806-5934
Party name: 197 Members of Congress
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Pro-Life Legal Defense Fund, et al.
Bradley Stephen Tupi
    Counsel of Record
1470 Redfern Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15241

bradtupi@gmail.com
4126162715
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York, et al.
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Upper Level
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-322-3207
Party name: Right to Life of Michigan
David Jonathan Weiner
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

david.weiner@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6702
Party name: LGBTQ Organizations
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Independence Law Center
Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Idaho Attorney General
954 W. Jefferson, Second Floor
Boise, ID 83720-0010

cynthia.wallace@ag.idaho.gov
208-332-3090
Party name: State of Idaho