No. 18-1309 | |
Title: | Booking.com B.V., Petitioner v. United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. |
Docketed: | April 16, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-2458, 17-2459) |
Decision Date: | February 4, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 5, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 10 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2019) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 10 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 16 2019 | Brief of respondents United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. filed. |
Proof of ServiceMain Document | |
May 16 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of The Association of Amicus Counsel filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 16 2019 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New York Intellectual Property Law Association. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 30 2019 | Reply of petitioner Booking.com B.V. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 04 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019. |
Dec 11 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019. |
Jun 30 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020. |
Jul 02 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New York Intellectual Property Law Association GRANTED. |
Jul 02 2020 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Peter v. NantKwest, Inc., 589 U. S. ___ (2019). |
Aug 03 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jonathan E. Moskin Counsel of Record | Foley & Lardner LL P 90 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 jmoskin@foley.com | 212-682-7474 |
Party name: Booking.com B.V. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Theodore H. Davis Jr. Counsel of Record | Kilpatrick & Cody 1100 Peachtree Street Suite 2800 Atlanta, GA 30309-4530 tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com | 4048156534 |
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association | ||
Charles Robert Macedo Counsel of Record | Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP 90 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 cmacedo@arelaw.com | 2123368000 |
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association | ||
Charles E. Miller Counsel of Record | Leichtman Law PLLC 3 Park Avenue, 15th Floor New York, NY 10016 charles.miller@cmilleriplaw.com | 212-419-5210 |
Party name: The Association of Amicus Counsel |