No. 18-1279
Title:K. Wendell Lewis, et al., Petitioners
v.
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Docketed:April 8, 2019
Linked with 18A920
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5068)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 11 2019Application (18A920) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 21, 2019 to April 4, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Mar 12 2019Application (18A920) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 4, 2019.
Apr 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2019Brief of respondent Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Reply of petitioners K. Wendell Lewis, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
May 28 2019Letter of K. Wendell Lewis, et al. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anthony F. Shelley
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ashelley@milchev.com
202-626-5800
Party name: K. Wendell Lewis, et al.
Anthony F. Shelley
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ashelley@milchev.com
202-626-5800
Party name: K. Wendell Lewis, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Joseph Martin Krettek II
    Counsel of Record
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
1200 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

krettek.joseph@pbgc.gov
202-326-4020
Party name: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation