No. 18-1276
Title:Andrew Levert, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10620)
   Decision Date:March 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 06 2019Response Requested. (Due June 5, 2019)
May 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2019 to July 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

jlfisher@omm.com
(650) 473-2633
Party name: Andrew Levert
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States