No. 18-127
Title:Amgen Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Sanofi, et al.
Docketed:July 27, 2018
Linked with 17A1262
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1480)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2018Application (17A1262) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2018 to July 23, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 14 2018Application (17A1262) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 23, 2018.
Jul 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Morphosys AG, Bavarian Nordic A/S, and UCB Biopharma SPRL filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Sep 18 2018Response Requested. (Due October 18, 2018)
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 19, 2018
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2018 to November 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Amgen Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: Sanofi, et al.
Other
Jorge Alberto Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox, P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgold@sternekessler.com
202-772-8609
Party name: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Morphosys AG, Bavarian Nordic A/S, and UCB Biopharma SPRL