No. 18-1265
Title:September Ends Co., et al., Petitioners
v.
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Docketed:April 2, 2019
Linked with 18A750
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3520)
   Decision Date:September 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2019Application (18A750) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 3, 2019 to March 5, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 20 2019Application (18A750) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 5, 2019.
Feb 21 2019Application (18A750) to extend further the time from March 5, 2019 to April 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Feb 22 2019Application (18A750) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 4, 2019.
Apr 02 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation to respond filed.
Main Document
May 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 08 2019Response Requested. (Due June 7, 2019)
May 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 7, 2019 to July 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2019.
Jul 03 2019Brief of respondent Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: September Ends Co., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Charles Lester Finke
    Counsel of Record
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
1200 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

finke.charles@pbgc.gov
202-229-3588
Party name: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation