No. 18-1259
Title:Brett Jones, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:March 29, 2019
Linked with 18A840
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2015-CT-00899-SCT)
   Decision Date:November 29, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 15 2019Application (18A840) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 27, 2019 to March 29, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Application (18A840) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 29, 2019.
Mar 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Waiver of right of respondent Mississippi to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
Apr 22 2019Response Requested. (Due May 22, 2019)
May 17 2019Motion of Mississippi for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (May 28, 2019)
May 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2019 to June 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 22 2019Motion of Scholars of Criminal Law for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (Corrected verison submitted).
May 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Criminal Law filed. (5/31/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 11, 2019.
Jun 11 2019Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Reply of petitioner Brett Jones filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
Mar 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 09 2020Petition GRANTED.
Mar 13 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 26 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 5, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 14, 2020. Petitioner's reply brief on the merits is due pursuant to Rule 25.3.
Jun 05 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 05 2020Brief of petitioner Brett Jones filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Madge Jones, Tony Jones, Marty Jones and Nicolle Olson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, The ACLU of Mississippi, The American Conservative Union Foundation, The Rutherford Institute, The R Street Institute, and Larry W. Yackle filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of Jonathan F. Mitchell & Adam K. Mortara in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Erwin Chemerinsky, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors, Department of Justice Officials, and Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Brief of respondent Mississippi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 3, 2020.
Aug 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 21 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Populi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Victims of Juvenile Murderers, et al. filed. (9/4/2020) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Record requested from the Supreme Court of Mississippi.
Sep 02 2020CIRCULATED
Sep 09 2020Record of the Supreme Court of Mississippi electronically received.
Sep 14 2020Reply of petitioner Brett Jones filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Brett Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Krissy Casey Nobile
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
550 High Street, Suite 1100
Jackson, MS 39205

knobi@ago.ms.gov
6013593824
Party name: Mississippi
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of Indiana Attorney General
IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana, et al.
Mitchell Keiter
    Counsel of Record
Keiter Appellate Law
The Beverly Hills Law Building, 424 South Beverly Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

mitchell.keiter@gmail.com
13105538533
Party name: Amicus Populi
Kent S. Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Kymberlee Claire Stapleton
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

kym.stapleton@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: National Organization of Victims of Juvenile Murderers and Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc.
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, the Mississippi Office of State Public Defender, and the Mississippi Public Defenders Association
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, The ACLU of Mississippi, The American Conservative Union Foundation, The Rutherford Institute, The R Street Institute, and Larry W. Yackle
Judy Perry Martinez
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: The American Bar Association
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection, Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors, Department of Justice Officials, and Judges
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck LLP
54 W. Hubbard St. Ste. 300
Chicago, IL 60654

taylor.meehan@bartlit-beck.com
3174083650
Party name: Jonathan F. Mitchell & Adam K. Mortara
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3052
Party name: Juvenile Law Center, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, and 65 Other Organizations and Individuals
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: Erwin Chemerinsky, et al.
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: SCHOLARS OF CRIMINAL LAW
Angela C. Vigil
    Counsel of Record
Baker and McKenzie LLP
Sabadell Financial Center
1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1700
Miami, FL 33131

angela.vigil@bakermckenzie.com
305-789-8900
Party name: Madge Jones, Tony Jones, Marty Jones and Nicolle Olson